MN HF1237 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State and local jail and prison inmates required to be housed in publicly owned and operated jails and prisons, and state and counties prohibited from contracting with private prisons.
Title
State and local jail and prison inmates required to be housed in publicly owned and operated jails and prisons, and state and counties prohibited from contracting with private prisons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Hausman |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Huot and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Lee, Sandell, and Dehn |
2019-02-16 | House | Referred by Chair to Corrections Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1678 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy