MN HF1257 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.
Title
Prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Committee report, without further recommendation re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Her and Hansen |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Brand and Poston |
2019-03-11 | House | Authors added Masin and Bahner |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1006 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy