MN HF1282 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Bierman and Demuth
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Bierman and Demuth
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional public library systems aid distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Regional public library systems aid distribution modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Bierman and Demuth |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Theis and Pierson |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Brand and Lueck |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Persell, Hamilton, Franson, and Sundin |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1704 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy