MN HF129 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governor's Council on Developmental Disabilities public member compensation and expense reimbursement required.
Title
Governor's Council on Developmental Disabilities public member compensation and expense reimbursement required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 53 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF149 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF149, now on General Orders |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-06 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF149 (Similar To) 2019-05-18 - Chief author added Abeler