MN HF132 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
New information technology business software user acceptance testing involvement required.
Title
New information technology business software user acceptance testing involvement required.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-05-07 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-07 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF316 |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF316 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed