MN HF1325 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pope County; Trunk Highway 55 and 29 interchange and railroad grade separation funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Pope County; Trunk Highway 55 and 29 interchange and railroad grade separation funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1466 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Capital Investment