MN HF1370 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Authors added Fischer and Hansen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Authors added Fischer and Hansen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gifted and talented provisions modified, and transitional outcomes improved.
Title
Gifted and talented provisions modified, and transitional outcomes improved.
Sponsors
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Authors added Fischer and Hansen |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Her |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added McDonald |
2019-03-11 | House | Authors added Gomez and Bahr |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Murphy and Edelson |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Masin and Lesch |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2655 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Author added Marty