MN HF1387 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health services any willing provider established, and money appropriated.
Title
Mental health services any willing provider established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Vogel |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1313 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy