MN HF1391 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School building bond agricultural credit modified.
Title
School building bond agricultural credit modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Kresha |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Petersburg, Bennett, Backer, Fabian, Anderson, Gunther, Poston, Lueck, and Daniels |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1512 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Taxes