MN HF1401 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Finance Agency program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing Finance Agency program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Xiong, J. and Jurgens |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1214 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance