MN HF1407 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Author added Bahner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Outpatient surgical centers facility sharing permitted.
Title
Outpatient surgical centers facility sharing permitted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-05-01 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-01 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1732 |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1732 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 22 05/09/2019