MN HF1471 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Division action, return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
World War I Minnesota veterans plaque authorized to be placed in Capitol grounds court of honor.
Title
World War I Minnesota veterans plaque authorized to be placed in Capitol grounds court of honor.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF160 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Chief author added Abeler