MN HF148 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community emergency medical technician permitted to be a member of a basic life support ambulance service, and occupational title of emergency medical technicians modified.
Title
Community emergency medical technician permitted to be a member of a basic life support ambulance service, and occupational title of emergency medical technicians modified.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 148 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 148 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 42 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-18 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2019-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2019-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2019-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2019-05-17 | House | Conference committee report |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate conferees Rose, Draheim, and Bigham |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate conferees Rosen; Draheim; Bigham |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House conferees Huot; Freiberg; Backer |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2019-05-09 | House | House conferees Huot, Freiberg, Backer |
2019-05-09 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Nornes |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-02-21 | House | Third reading |
2019-02-21 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 21st, 2019 |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1074 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - HF substituted in committee HF148