MN HF1487 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections administration, voting, voter registration, polling places, ballots, recounts, contests, candidates, and related provisions technical and policy changes made.
Title
Elections administration, voting, voter registration, polling places, ballots, recounts, contests, candidates, and related provisions technical and policy changes made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 121 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Laid on table |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Taken from table |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Laid on table |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-02 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 02, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2582 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections