MN HF149 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan company prohibited from contractually preventing a pharmacist from informing a patient of a price differential.
Title
Health plan company prohibited from contractually preventing a pharmacist from informing a patient of a price differential.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Sanstede |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added West |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Moller, Lee, and Loeffler |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF237 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Author added Marty