MN HF1495 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher training required to implement instructional strategies to meet dyslexic needs in all teaching license tiers.
Title
Teacher training required to implement instructional strategies to meet dyslexic needs in all teaching license tiers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Fischer and Lillie |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |