MN HF1520 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
911 dispatchers required to be trained to provide cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction, monitoring and enforcement provided, civil immunity established, and money appropriated.
Title
911 dispatchers required to be trained to provide cardiopulmonary resuscitation instruction, monitoring and enforcement provided, civil immunity established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Anderson |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Long |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1638 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Abeler