MN HF1523 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Kunesh-Podein
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Kunesh-Podein
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of human services directed to establish prescription drug purchasing program, and program authority and eligibility requirements specified.
Title
Commissioner of human services directed to establish prescription drug purchasing program, and program authority and eligibility requirements specified.
Sponsors
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-03-05 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1734 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy