MN HF1525 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-07 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motorcycle profiling policies established.
Title
Motorcycle profiling policies established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added McDonald |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1690 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Author added Sparks