MN HF1541 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care centers required to provide proof of surety bond coverage.
Title
Child care centers required to provide proof of surety bond coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Miller and Grossell |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kresha |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1846 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy