MN HF1577 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Layman
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Author added Layman
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Town road and bridge assistance account created, and money transferred.
Title
Town road and bridge assistance account created, and money transferred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Layman |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Anderson |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1671 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy