MN HF1580 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Durable medical equipment and medical supplies supplemental payments provided to providers.
Title
Durable medical equipment and medical supplies supplemental payments provided to providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Lesch |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1248 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy