MN HF163 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Bill was passed as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Education; prekindergarten through grade 12 education policy changes made including general education, education excellence, teacher licensing, health and safety, special education, and early childhood education; and changes made to a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; prekindergarten through grade 12 education policy changes made including general education, education excellence, teacher licensing, health and safety, special education, and early childhood education; and changes made to a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-17 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 77 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - House - House: 72 - Amendment to Youakim amendment - Nays (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-17 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 74 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-17 - House - House: 73 - Amendment to Youakim Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-17 - House - House: 74 - Amendment to Youakim Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment to Youakim Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-17 - House - House: 73 - Amendment to Youakim Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17HouseBill was passed as amended
2020-05-17HouseThird reading as amended
2020-05-17HouseAmended
2020-05-17HouseAmendments offered
2020-05-17HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-17HouseMotion to take from table
2020-05-17HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-17HousePoint of order raised, ruled not well taken
2020-05-17HouseMotion to lay on the table
2020-05-17HouseAmendments offered
2020-05-16HouseAuthor added Pinto
2020-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020
2020-05-11HouseSecond reading
2020-05-11HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2020-05-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2020-05-09HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2020-05-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2020-03-11HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading
2019-02-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3034 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Author added Clausen

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0163&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF163&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF163&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF163&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10636
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10637
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10638
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10639
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10640
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10648
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0163&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10649

Bill Comments

feedback