MN HF1658 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed foster home provider liability insurance coverage expanded.
Title
Licensed foster home provider liability insurance coverage expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1564 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy