MN HF1659 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Acomb
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Acomb
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexually exploited youth and youth at risk shelter, services, and other activities funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Sexually exploited youth and youth at risk shelter, services, and other activities funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Bierman and Dehn |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1868 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy