MN HF1662 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Economic welfare measurement established, state budget forecast inclusion of economic measure required, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Economic welfare measurement established, state budget forecast inclusion of economic measure required, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Author added Munson |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1742 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy