MN HF1724 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance program eligibility restrictions extended.
Title
Child care assistance program eligibility restrictions extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Scott, Koznick, and Runbeck |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1845 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy