MN HF1744 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family law mediation task force established.
Title
Family law mediation task force established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1829 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy