MN HF1768 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacists providing drug manufacturer information to patients required.
Title
Pharmacists providing drug manufacturer information to patients required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF2110 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy