MN HF1788 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Author added Drazkowski.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pornography; a resolution recognizing pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms and memorializing Congress to recognize this hazard and address pornography at a national level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pornography; a resolution recognizing pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms and memorializing Congress to recognize this hazard and address pornography at a national level.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseAuthor added Drazkowski.
2017-03-23HouseAuthor added Peterson.
2017-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF1605 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback