MN HF1804 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Pelowski
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Pelowski
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Twin Cities-Milwaukee-Chicago (TCMC) second train development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Twin Cities-Milwaukee-Chicago (TCMC) second train development funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Pelowski |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1975 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy