MN HF1864 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Presentence investigation reports inclusion of brain injury information authorized.
Title
Presentence investigation reports inclusion of brain injury information authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Lee |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Tabke |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Considine |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Gomez, Dehn, Howard, Miller, Her, Stephenson, Cantrell, Edelson, and Lucero |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1994 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy