MN HF1874 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care providers reporting requirement non-compliance penalty added.
Title
Child care providers reporting requirement non-compliance penalty added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |