MN HF1883 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 81 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 81 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Foster care student enrollment in school required, and foster youth school enrollment report required.
Title
Foster care student enrollment in school required, and foster youth school enrollment report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: MESSAGES FROM THE SENATE (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 81 05/12/2020 | |
2020-05-12 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-12 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-12 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2020-05-12 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-12 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-11 | House | Author added Carlson, L. (chief) |
2020-05-11 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-08 | House | Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1873 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Chief author added Gazelka