MN HF1909 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wine direct shippers regulated; sales and use taxes, liquor gross receipts taxes, and excise taxes on direct shipments of wine imposed; licensing provided and reports required; data classification provided; and bootlegging prohibited.
Title
Wine direct shippers regulated; sales and use taxes, liquor gross receipts taxes, and excise taxes on direct shipments of wine imposed; licensing provided and reports required; data classification provided; and bootlegging prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-28 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1932 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy