MN HF1928 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Dehn
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Dehn
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean Water Legacy Act funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Clean Water Legacy Act funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2262 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance