MN HF1960 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Commerce; various technical provisions changed.
Title
Department of Commerce; various technical provisions changed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1960 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1960 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 59 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-05-19 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2310 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2310, now on General Orders |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF2310 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1960