MN HF1981 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Olson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Olson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health commissioner local public health grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Health commissioner local public health grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1364 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy