MN HF1982 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School calendar adjustment authorized for instructional days and work hours lost due to school closings during the 2018-2019 school year.
Title
School calendar adjustment authorized for instructional days and work hours lost due to school closings during the 2018-2019 school year.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-03-13 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-03-13 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1743 |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1743 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019