MN HF2 | 2019 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special session jobs, economic development, energy, and commerce finance bill.
Title
Special session jobs, economic development, energy, and commerce finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 52 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 52 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 51 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 7 | |
2019-05-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-30 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-30 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-28 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-24 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-24 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Amendments offered |
2019-05-24 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
SF2 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Laid on table