MN HF201 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home common law eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.
Title
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home common law eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2019-02-21 | House | Author changed Grossell as chief author |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Erickson |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Albright, Daniels, Schomacker, Johnson, Theis, and Backer |
2019-01-22 | House | Authors added Poston, Bennett, O'Neill, Grossell, Franson, and Dettmer |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF72 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy