MN HF2097 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin County; library director qualifications modified.
Title
Hennepin County; library director qualifications modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 81 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 81 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 48 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2267 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2267, now on General Orders |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-13 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Amended |
2019-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2267 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2097