MN HF211 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Author added Mariani
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed physical therapists authorized to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons.
Title
Licensed physical therapists authorized to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 3 03/12/2019 | |
2019-03-12 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-03-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-03-12 | Governor approval | |
2019-03-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF653 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF653 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading |
2019-02-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Backer, Christensen, Huot, Olson, and Noor |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF653 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF211