MN HF2125 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate conferees Chamberlain; Senjem; Dahms; Howe; Rest
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate conferees Chamberlain; Senjem; Dahms; Howe; Rest
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill.
Title
Omnibus tax bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment to Neu Amendment - H2125A48 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Marquart - Amendment to Neu Amendment - H2125A59 (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - H2125A25 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - H2125A47 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A56 (Y: 3 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A30 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A28 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment - H2125A24 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment to O'Neill Amendment - H2125A42 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment, as amended - H2125A55 (Y: 48 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Albright - Amendment to Drazkowski Amendment - H2125A60 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment - H2125A52 (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment to Neu Amendment - H2125A48 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Marquart - Amendment to Neu Amendment - H2125A59 (Y: 76 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - H2125A25 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Petersburg Amendment - H2125A47 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A56 (Y: 3 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A30 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Hertaus - Amendment to Albright Amendment - H2125A28 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: O'Neill - Amendment - H2125A24 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Garofalo - Amendment to O'Neill Amendment - H2125A42 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment, as amended - H2125A55 (Y: 48 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Albright - Amendment to Drazkowski Amendment - H2125A60 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Drazkowski - Amendment - H2125A52 (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Senjem; Dahms; Howe; Rest |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate conferees Chamberlain, Senjem, Dahms, Howe, Rest. |
2019-05-01 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2019-04-30 | House | House conferees Marquart, Loeffler, Lislegard, Gomez, Davids |
2019-04-30 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-04-30 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House conferees Marquart; Loeffler; Lislegard; Gomez; Davids |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF5 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF5, now on General Orders |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2411 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Taxes
SF5 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2125
SF5 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2125