MN HF226 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Author added Jessup
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - Author added Jessup
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.
Title
Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Jim Knoblach [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Anne Neu Brindley [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Randy Jessup [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Author added Jessup |
2018-02-22 | House | Authors added Franke and Jurgens. |
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Neu. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Smith. |
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Gunther. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Grossell. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Bahr, C. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Runbeck. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-02-20 | House | Author added Baker. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Bennett. |
2017-02-09 | House | Authors added Poppe; Anderson, S.; and Hoppe. |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-06 | House | Author added Nornes. |
2017-02-02 | House | Authors added Green, Lillie, Albright, Franson, and McDonald. |
2017-02-01 | House | Authors added Kresha, Howe, Daniels, Swedzinski, and Lueck. |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Nash. |
2017-01-26 | House | Authors added Drazkowski, Knoblach, and Marquart. |
2017-01-19 | House | Author added Lien. |
2017-01-17 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF419 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - Author added Anderson, P.