MN HF2319 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services program integrity modified, criminal penalties created, and money appropriated.
Title
Human services program integrity modified, criminal penalties created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2774 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Author added Hayden