MN HF2387 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Employees Retirement Association increased employer contributions funding extended from state aid to local governments.
Title
Public Employees Retirement Association increased employer contributions funding extended from state aid to local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-20 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2488 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections