MN HF2476 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special education funding formula modified, aid increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Special education funding formula modified, aid increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Daniels |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2730 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy