MN HF2480 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-16 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-16 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voluntary prekindergarten participant portion required to be served through mixed-delivery services.
Title
Voluntary prekindergarten participant portion required to be served through mixed-delivery services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1238 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy