MN HF2486 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Backer and Lien
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Backer and Lien
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance reimbursement rate for crisis stabilization services in residential settings increased.
Title
Medical assistance reimbursement rate for crisis stabilization services in residential settings increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Backer and Lien |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2696 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy